U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-07003
  • Case Name: Ahlgren, Trustee v. McM Limited Partnership V
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • January 07, 2022: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • January 07, 2022: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • January 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • January 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.