U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07032
  • Case Name: Velde, Trustee v. McMartin, Sr. et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • May 08, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • May 08, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • May 07, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • January 28, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • January 28, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
  • January 15, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • December 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • December 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • December 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • December 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • November 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • November 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Video Conference]
  • November 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Video Conference Hearing]
  • November 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • October 23, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • October 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • October 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • April 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • March 06, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • March 06, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Compel]
  • March 06, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • March 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • March 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • February 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • February 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • February 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time (with 14 day Notice)]
  • February 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • February 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • January 28, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • January 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • January 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • January 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.