U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07031
  • Case Name: Ahlgren, Trustee v. McMartin, Sr. et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • October 05, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • October 05, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Stipulation]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Compel]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 24, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Compel]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • January 16, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • January 16, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
  • January 15, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • December 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • December 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • December 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • July 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • April 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • April 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • March 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time (with 14 day Notice)]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Compel]
  • January 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • January 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • January 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.