U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07002
  • Case Name: Velde, Trustee v. RGMC Properties, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • May 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reply]
  • April 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [xGeneric Motion (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • January 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • January 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • January 23, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Stipulation]
  • January 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • January 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.