U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30018
  • Case Name: Robert E Johnson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Document]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Document]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Dismissal]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Dismissing Case]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Comply]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Waive Filing Fee]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Document]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Waive Filing Fee]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Waive Filing Fee]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.