U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-07004
  • Case Name: Doeling v. Lynn
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • January 09, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
July, 2019
  • July 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • July 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
  • June 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • May 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • May 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • March 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • March 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • March 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • March 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • February 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • January 17, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • January 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.