U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07047
  • Case Name: Velde, Trustee v. McMartin, Sr. et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • May 08, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • May 08, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • May 07, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Misc Notice]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • January 15, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
  • January 15, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • December 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • December 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • November 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • November 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • November 06, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • October 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • October 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • October 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • October 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
August, 2019
  • August 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • August 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • August 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • August 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • July 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • July 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • July 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • July 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • March 21, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • March 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • March 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • March 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • March 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • February 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • February 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Case]
  • February 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • January 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • January 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.