U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30033
  • Case Name: Mark Anthony Lang
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Delay Discharge]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Delay Discharge]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.