U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30035
  • Case Name: Shellene J Ragan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Final Account]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Final Report]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Correspondence]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Report of Sale - Text Event]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
May, 2020
  • May 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
  • May 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Provisional Order Employing]
  • May 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • April 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Sale Agreement]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Adversary Case]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Complaint]
November, 2019
  • November 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • October 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon conversion)]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Intent]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • September 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Convert Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (Debtor)]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Convert Case]
  • September 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Convert Case 13 to 7 Voluntarily by Debtor]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Examination]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Examination]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
January, 2019
  • January 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.