U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07027
  • Case Name: Velde, Trustee v. Blomquist et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • July 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • July 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Stipulation]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • May 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • May 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Witness List]
  • April 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • April 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order to Set Hearing]
  • April 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 23, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • April 23, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • April 23, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reply]
  • April 17, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Objection]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • March 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
  • March 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time (with 14 day Notice)]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • February 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
  • January 28, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • January 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.