U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30045
  • Case Name: MaDonna Mary Newbury
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • March 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Waiver of Credit Counseling]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment of Installment Fee (Final-Chapter 7)]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Comply]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Waive Filing Fee]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Waiver of Credit Counseling]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Waive Filing Fee]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.