U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30050
  • Case Name: Kevin L Blake and Ursula M Blake
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Send Document/Notice to BNC for Service]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Cancelled]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Dismiss Case for Abuse]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
March, 2019
  • March 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Presumed Abuse]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
February, 2019
  • February 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.