U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30051
  • Case Name: Darin J. Vangsness
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2019
  • February 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 12 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon dismissal)]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismissing Case]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.