U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-07006
  • Case Name: Ahlgren, Trustee v. A. & L. Potato Company
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • July 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • July 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
  • June 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • June 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • March 21, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • March 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • March 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • March 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • March 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • March 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • February 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • February 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.