U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30053
  • Case Name: Joshua Norby
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [UST Statement of Declination]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Presumed Abuse]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon conversion)]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Convert Case]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Convert Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (Debtor)]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Convert Case 13 to 7 Voluntarily by Debtor]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Convert Case 13 to 7 Voluntarily by Debtor]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Simplified Application for Compensation]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation - Ch 13 Simplified Application]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
April, 2019
  • April 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulation]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reply of No Objection]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • February 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.