U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-07007
  • Case Name: Ahlgren, Trustee v. CHS, Inc., a Minnesota cooperative,
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • May 04, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • May 04, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
  • April 09, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • April 09, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • February 13, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Set (Other)]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
  • January 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • December 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Objection]
  • November 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • November 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
  • November 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Protective Order]
  • October 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • October 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time (with 14 day Notice)]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • July 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • June 17, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Corporate Ownership Statement]
  • June 17, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order to Set Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • April 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Oral Argument]
  • April 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Request for Oral Argument]
  • April 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reply]
  • April 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reply]
  • March 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Recusal]
  • March 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • March 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Recusal]
  • March 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • March 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • February 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.