Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota
    Case Number:19-30057
    Party Name:Jamie Kiecker and Rebecca Kiecker
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update EOUST Stats]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Creditors Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ndb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?42467
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =