open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota
    Case Number:19-30058
    Party Name:Oscar Y. Zubiate, Sr.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:June 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ndb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?42468
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =