U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30067
  • Case Name: Cheryline D Ochsner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
May, 2019
  • May 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Waive Filing Fee]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Waive Filing Fee]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Payment Advices]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.