U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-07008
  • Case Name: Knife River Corporation v. Reimer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • April 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • April 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • March 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • March 06, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • March 06, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • February 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Expedite Hearing]
  • February 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Expedite Hearing]
  • February 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.