U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-07019
  • Case Name: Vanity Shop of Grand Forks, Inc. v. Creative Worldwide Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 19, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 29, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
  • January 27, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Vacate]
  • January 27, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • January 09, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Vacate]
  • January 07, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • November 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Vacate]
  • November 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reopen Adversary ]
  • November 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reopen Adversary ]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order (Batch)]
  • April 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • April 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Request to Reissue Summons]
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order Seeking Input Regarding Discovery and Trial Scheduling]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.