U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-07014
  • Case Name: Vanity Shop of Grand Forks, Inc. v. By Design L.L.C.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • July 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order (Batch)]
  • April 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • April 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • April 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Order]
  • April 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order Seeking Input Regarding Discovery and Trial Scheduling]
  • March 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.