U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-07013
  • Case Name: Vanity Shop of Grand Forks, Inc. v. Blue Ambrosia, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order Seeking Input Regarding Discovery and Trial Scheduling]
  • March 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • March 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • March 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Request to Reissue Summons]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.