U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-07061
  • Case Name: Vanity Shop of Grand Forks, Inc. v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • October 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • October 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Stipulation]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • July 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • July 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order (Batch)]
  • April 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order Seeking Input Regarding Discovery and Trial Scheduling]
  • March 28, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.