U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-07055
  • Case Name: Vanity Shop of Grand Forks, Inc. v. Suzhou Hengrun Import & Export Corp., Ltd.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 18, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • February 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • January 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • April 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • April 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order Seeking Input Regarding Discovery and Trial Scheduling]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.