U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-07063
  • Case Name: Vanity Shop of Grand Forks, Inc. v. Famma Group, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • August 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • August 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • August 06, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Stipulation]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • July 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • July 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time (with 14 day Notice)]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • May 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order (Batch)]
  • April 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • April 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order Seeking Input Regarding Discovery and Trial Scheduling]
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.