U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-07062
  • Case Name: Vanity Shop of Grand Forks, Inc. v. East Lion Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • May 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • May 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Party]
  • May 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • May 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Misc Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order (Batch)]
  • April 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • April 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order Seeking Input Regarding Discovery and Trial Scheduling]
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • March 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.