U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-07048
  • Case Name: Vanity Shop of Grand Forks, Inc. v. Pomeroy IT Solutions Sales Company, Inc. dba Getro
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • January 21, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • January 21, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • January 21, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Stipulation]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • May 28, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order (Batch)]
  • April 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order Seeking Input Regarding Discovery and Trial Scheduling]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.