U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30092
  • Case Name: Michelle Soldier
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Disapprove Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Hearing Held]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Schedule J]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Schedule I]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.