U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-07016
  • Case Name: Vanity Shop of Grand Forks, Inc. v. Cavalini, Inc. dba Ci Sono
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • November 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • November 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Stipulation]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Misc Notice]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 17, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • July 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Appear pro hac vice]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order (Batch)]
  • April 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • April 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order Seeking Input Regarding Discovery and Trial Scheduling]
  • March 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.