U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30129
  • Case Name: Kyle Hodges
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon dismissal)]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
March, 2019
  • March 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.