U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30127
  • Case Name: Terrie C Silbernagel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon completion)]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 27, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTERS Other than 7]
  • June 26, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Plan Payments Complete]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Motion to Discontinue Wage Assignment]
  • April 22, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Discontinue Wage Assignment]
  • April 20, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certification of Domestic Support Obligations]
February, 2020
  • February 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Transfer of Claim with BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Transfer of Claim]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Simplified Application for Compensation]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation - Ch 13 Simplified Application]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Wage Assignment Order]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulated Application for Wage Assignment]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.