U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30135
  • Case Name: Marty Lynn Pederson and Wendy Sandell Swerdlo Pederson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
November, 2020
  • November 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
October, 2020
  • October 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement Reviewed]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon conversion)]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon conversion)]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Convert Case]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Convert Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (Debtor)]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Intent]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Convert Case 13 to 7 Voluntarily by Debtor]
May, 2019
  • May 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Simplified Application for Compensation]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation - Ch 13 Simplified Application]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.