U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30144
  • Case Name: Philip Jeter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
June, 2019
  • June 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.