U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30151
  • Case Name: Amanda C Johnson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Preserve Unadministered Asset Order]
  • May 09, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion to Preserve Unadministered Asset]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
May, 2019
  • May 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
March, 2019
  • March 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.