U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30170
  • Case Name: Ryan J. Nieuwsma and Amber D. Nieuwsma
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
June, 2019
  • June 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
March, 2019
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.