U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30168
  • Case Name: Robert James Reynolds, Jr. and Alexandria Marie Reynolds
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Adversary Case]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Affidavit]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Complaint]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
June, 2019
  • June 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Cancelled]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Rescission]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
March, 2019
  • March 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment of Installment Fee-Chapter 7]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.