U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-07067
  • Case Name: Doeling v. Reeves-Maguire
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • October 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • August 06, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
  • August 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • May 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • May 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Request to Reissue Summons]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.