U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-07068
  • Case Name: Doeling v. Soeby
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • October 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • October 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
  • October 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Order]
  • October 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
  • September 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • August 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.