U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-07070
  • Case Name: Security First Bank of North Dakota v. Reimer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • June 10, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • June 10, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • June 04, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • June 04, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • June 01, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • October 01, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • October 01, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 30, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time (with 14 day Notice)]
  • September 30, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • September 30, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • March 20, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • March 20, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • March 20, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • March 20, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • March 19, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • March 18, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • February 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • February 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
January, 2020
  • January 20, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 20, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • January 20, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • January 15, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Memorandum and Order]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • October 28, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • October 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stay]
  • August 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stay]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • July 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • July 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • June 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • June 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • June 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • May 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • April 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • April 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.