U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30208
  • Case Name: William Snyder
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • August 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.