U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30231
  • Case Name: Jolene E Gust
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Final Account]
July, 2020
  • July 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • July 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Close Adversary Case]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Correspondence]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Final Report]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Stipulation]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Approve Stipulation]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Stipulation]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Turnover Property]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Amended Schedules]
August, 2019
  • August 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Sell]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Hearing Held]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Stipulation]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Objection]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Financial Management Course]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Complaint]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Sell]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Assets]
June, 2019
  • June 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.