U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30243
  • Case Name: Samantha J Willason and Christopher A Willason
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.