U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30253
  • Case Name: Pedro George Rubke, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • August 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • July 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment of Installment Fee-Chapter 7]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.