U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30265
  • Case Name: Samantha Kaye Harshman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Final Account]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Report of Unclaimed Funds/Funds Less Than 5.00]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Final Report]
  • July 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Report of Sale - Text Event]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Adversary Case]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Settlement Agreement]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Complaint]
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Update Claim]
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Order (Generic)]
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Hearing Cancelled]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Send Document/Notice to BNC for Service]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Objection to Claim]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Schedule E/F]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
  • September 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
May, 2019
  • May 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.