U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30321
  • Case Name: Brenna Hutmacher
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • July 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • July 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon conversion)]
May, 2020
  • May 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • May 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Intent]
  • May 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule J]
  • May 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule I]
  • May 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Document]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Convert Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (Debtor)]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Convert Case]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Convert Case 13 to 7]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Convert Case 13 to 7]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Convert Case 13 to 7 Voluntarily by Debtor]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Convert Case 13 to 7 Voluntarily by Debtor]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
July, 2019
  • July 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Liquidation Analysis]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.