U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30322
  • Case Name: Allen Paul Rolczynski and Laurie Lee Rolczynski
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Party]
  • August 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case (21 day notice)]
  • July 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation - Ch 13 Simplified Application]
  • July 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modify Plan (After Confirmation)]
  • July 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modified Plan (after confirmation)]
  • July 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
  • July 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • July 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • June 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Simplified Application for Compensation]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation - Ch 13 Simplified Application]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.