U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-07077
  • Case Name: Kaler v. Trust and Estate Search, LLC.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 05, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • September 08, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • September 08, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • September 04, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • September 04, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • September 04, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • September 02, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • August 26, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • August 26, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 26, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • August 25, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exhibit]
  • August 21, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • August 21, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • August 19, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • August 19, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Witness List]
  • August 18, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Documents]
  • August 18, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exhibit List]
  • August 18, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Witness List]
  • August 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exhibit List]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • May 22, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • December 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • December 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • December 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • November 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • September 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • August 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • August 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • August 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.