open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota

NORTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota
    Case Number:19-30454
    Party Name:Darcy Jo Anderson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Simplified Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation - Ch 13 Simplified Application]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reply of No Objection]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
    Date Published:October 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Creditors Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ndb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?42935
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =