open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota

NORTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of North Dakota
    Case Number:19-30453
    Party Name:Scott Michael Green
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Settlement Agreement]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ndb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?42934
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =